Senate | 09/22/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 09/22/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 3429.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1802.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1519.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |