Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 179, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3428.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2323.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Senator Galgiani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Set for hearing August 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2001.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Set for hearing July 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|