Senate | 09/22/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 180, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 09/22/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/15/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Page 3487.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 09/08/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2017 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2017 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |