Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67Introduced by Senator AndersonJune 28, 2017 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) is a rare disease that is known to cause muscle weakness and wasting; andWHEREAS, LGMD most commonly affects muscles closest to the body, known as proximal muscles, specifically the muscles of the shoulders, upper arms, pelvic area, and thighs; andWHEREAS, LGMD is not one disease, but a group of hereditary, genetic, neuromuscular disorders with more than 25 subtypes currently identified; andWHEREAS, LGMD occurs among all ethnic groups, affects both males and females, and can begin in childhood, adolescence, or adulthood; andWHEREAS, LGMD is a progressive, serious, and debilitating condition that has a significant impact on the lives of those affected; andWHEREAS, Individuals and families affected by LGMD often experience problems like diagnosis delay, difficulty finding a medical expert, and lack of access to treatments and ancillary services; andWHEREAS, Research is ongoing and important advances are being made every day in understanding the genetic causes for the disease, but there is still no known cure or treatment; andWHEREAS, While the public is familiar with some rare diseases, like amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS), and are sympathetic to those affected, many patients and families affected by LGMD bear a large share of the burden of raising public awareness to support the search for treatments; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Annual Awareness Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67Introduced by Senator AndersonJune 28, 2017 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017 Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67 Introduced by Senator AndersonJune 28, 2017 Introduced by Senator Anderson June 28, 2017 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day. This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) is a rare disease that is known to cause muscle weakness and wasting; and WHEREAS, LGMD most commonly affects muscles closest to the body, known as proximal muscles, specifically the muscles of the shoulders, upper arms, pelvic area, and thighs; and WHEREAS, LGMD is not one disease, but a group of hereditary, genetic, neuromuscular disorders with more than 25 subtypes currently identified; and WHEREAS, LGMD occurs among all ethnic groups, affects both males and females, and can begin in childhood, adolescence, or adulthood; and WHEREAS, LGMD is a progressive, serious, and debilitating condition that has a significant impact on the lives of those affected; and WHEREAS, Individuals and families affected by LGMD often experience problems like diagnosis delay, difficulty finding a medical expert, and lack of access to treatments and ancillary services; and WHEREAS, Research is ongoing and important advances are being made every day in understanding the genetic causes for the disease, but there is still no known cure or treatment; and WHEREAS, While the public is familiar with some rare diseases, like amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS), and are sympathetic to those affected, many patients and families affected by LGMD bear a large share of the burden of raising public awareness to support the search for treatments; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Annual Awareness Day; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.