California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR67 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67 CHAPTER 153 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 14, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) is a rare disease that is known to cause muscle weakness and wasting; andWHEREAS, LGMD most commonly affects muscles closest to the body, known as proximal muscles, specifically the muscles of the shoulders, upper arms, pelvic area, and thighs; andWHEREAS, LGMD is not one disease, but a group of hereditary, genetic, neuromuscular disorders with more than 25 subtypes currently identified; andWHEREAS, LGMD occurs among all ethnic groups, affects both males and females, and can begin in childhood, adolescence, or adulthood; andWHEREAS, LGMD is a progressive, serious, and debilitating condition that has a significant impact on the lives of those affected; andWHEREAS, Individuals and families affected by LGMD often experience problems like diagnosis delay, difficulty finding a medical expert, and lack of access to treatments and ancillary services; andWHEREAS, Research is ongoing and important advances are being made every day in understanding the genetic causes for the disease, but there is still no known cure or treatment; andWHEREAS, While the public is familiar with some rare diseases, like amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS), and are sympathetic to those affected, many patients and families affected by LGMD bear a large share of the burden of raising public awareness to support the search for treatments; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Annual Awareness Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67Introduced by Senator AndersonJune 28, 2017 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) is a rare disease that is known to cause muscle weakness and wasting; andWHEREAS, LGMD most commonly affects muscles closest to the body, known as proximal muscles, specifically the muscles of the shoulders, upper arms, pelvic area, and thighs; andWHEREAS, LGMD is not one disease, but a group of hereditary, genetic, neuromuscular disorders with more than 25 subtypes currently identified; andWHEREAS, LGMD occurs among all ethnic groups, affects both males and females, and can begin in childhood, adolescence, or adulthood; andWHEREAS, LGMD is a progressive, serious, and debilitating condition that has a significant impact on the lives of those affected; andWHEREAS, Individuals and families affected by LGMD often experience problems like diagnosis delay, difficulty finding a medical expert, and lack of access to treatments and ancillary services; andWHEREAS, Research is ongoing and important advances are being made every day in understanding the genetic causes for the disease, but there is still no known cure or treatment; andWHEREAS, While the public is familiar with some rare diseases, like amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS), and are sympathetic to those affected, many patients and families affected by LGMD bear a large share of the burden of raising public awareness to support the search for treatments; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Annual Awareness Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67 CHAPTER 153 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 14, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67Introduced by Senator AndersonJune 28, 2017 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
4+
5+ Enrolled September 11, 2017 Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017 Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017
6+
7+Enrolled September 11, 2017
8+Passed IN Senate July 10, 2017
9+Passed IN Assembly September 07, 2017
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 67
6-CHAPTER 153
14+
15+Introduced by Senator AndersonJune 28, 2017
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Anderson
18+June 28, 2017
719
820 Relative to Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State September 14, 2017. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 SCR 67, Anderson. Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Awareness Day.
1727
1828 This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.
1929
2030 This measure would proclaim September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) Annual Awareness Day.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy (LGMD) is a rare disease that is known to cause muscle weakness and wasting; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, LGMD most commonly affects muscles closest to the body, known as proximal muscles, specifically the muscles of the shoulders, upper arms, pelvic area, and thighs; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, LGMD is not one disease, but a group of hereditary, genetic, neuromuscular disorders with more than 25 subtypes currently identified; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, LGMD occurs among all ethnic groups, affects both males and females, and can begin in childhood, adolescence, or adulthood; and
3343
3444 WHEREAS, LGMD is a progressive, serious, and debilitating condition that has a significant impact on the lives of those affected; and
3545
3646 WHEREAS, Individuals and families affected by LGMD often experience problems like diagnosis delay, difficulty finding a medical expert, and lack of access to treatments and ancillary services; and
3747
3848 WHEREAS, Research is ongoing and important advances are being made every day in understanding the genetic causes for the disease, but there is still no known cure or treatment; and
3949
4050 WHEREAS, While the public is familiar with some rare diseases, like amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS), and are sympathetic to those affected, many patients and families affected by LGMD bear a large share of the burden of raising public awareness to support the search for treatments; now, therefore, be it
4151
4252 Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims September 30, 2017, and each September 30th thereafter, as Limb Girdle Muscular Dystrophy Annual Awareness Day; and be it further
4353
4454 Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.