Senate | 09/14/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 09/14/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3050.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 5). | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2247.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |