Senate | 04/10/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4531.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 09/16/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/15/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3002.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2017 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2017 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |