Senate | 02/27/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4065.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 13). | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2284.) (August 29). | ||
Senate | 08/25/2017 | Set for hearing August 29. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |