Senate | 05/04/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4939.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4541.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2018 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/03/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |