Assembly | 07/03/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5028.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2018 | Set for hearing June 25. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2018 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5065.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |