Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6257.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4213.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2018
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|