Senate | 02/22/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4030.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 8). | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4137.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |