Senate | 03/08/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 26). | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4187.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |