Senate | 09/11/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6518.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 20). | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5225.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2018 | From inactive file. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2018 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Newman. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |