Senate | 09/22/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 189, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 09/22/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/16/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 09/15/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 3494.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (September 14). | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2274.) (August 29). | ||
Senate | 08/24/2017 | Set for hearing August 29. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |