California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SJR11 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/20/2017

                    Enrolled  September 20, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 15, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Joint Resolution No. 11Introduced by Senator SternAugust 21, 2017 Relative to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSJR 11, Stern. Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity: voter data protection.This measure would urge each state secretary of state and other relevant state elections officials to join California in refusing to provide state voter data to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, State elections officials recently received a request for voter data, including Social Security information, from President Donald Trumps Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity; and WHEREAS, Elections and cybersecurity experts across the country have warned that the commissions request raises major privacy and security concerns; and WHEREAS, There are many outstanding questions about how the voter data would be transferred, stored, and used; and WHEREAS, The commission already faces several pending lawsuits from national civil rights and voting rights groups; and WHEREAS, These lawsuits send a strong message that the commission, which has no power to compel any state to cooperate, will not go unchallenged; and WHEREAS, Individuals associated with the commission have a history of implementing and advocating for voter suppression policies and tactics; and WHEREAS, The United States Constitution recognizes the authority and autonomy of the states to regulate the manner of administration of elections, including the maintenance of voter rolls; and WHEREAS, Prevention and detection of voter fraud and voter suppression, while simultaneously increasing voter participation among all eligible citizens, should be a paramount goal of all states and the federal government; and WHEREAS, States are responsible for protecting the integrity of their elections, including the secrecy of the ballot, security of their election infrastructures, and protection of sensitive personal information included in voter rolls; and WHEREAS, Secretary of State Alex Padilla and the chief elections officials of numerous other states have refused to provide the commission with the requested voter data due to concerns over its security and use; and WHEREAS, California is recognized as a leader in voter outreach and inclusion, and consistently seeks to eliminate barriers to civic participation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature urges each state secretary of state and other relevant state elections officials to join California in refusing to provide their state voter data to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the secretary of state of each state as well as to each state governor. 

 Enrolled  September 20, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 15, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Joint Resolution No. 11Introduced by Senator SternAugust 21, 2017 Relative to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSJR 11, Stern. Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity: voter data protection.This measure would urge each state secretary of state and other relevant state elections officials to join California in refusing to provide state voter data to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  September 20, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 Passed IN  Assembly  September 15, 2017

Enrolled  September 20, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  September 01, 2017
Passed IN  Assembly  September 15, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Joint Resolution No. 11

Introduced by Senator SternAugust 21, 2017

Introduced by Senator Stern
August 21, 2017

 Relative to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SJR 11, Stern. Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity: voter data protection.

This measure would urge each state secretary of state and other relevant state elections officials to join California in refusing to provide state voter data to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity.

This measure would urge each state secretary of state and other relevant state elections officials to join California in refusing to provide state voter data to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, State elections officials recently received a request for voter data, including Social Security information, from President Donald Trumps Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity; and 

WHEREAS, Elections and cybersecurity experts across the country have warned that the commissions request raises major privacy and security concerns; and 

WHEREAS, There are many outstanding questions about how the voter data would be transferred, stored, and used; and 

WHEREAS, The commission already faces several pending lawsuits from national civil rights and voting rights groups; and 

WHEREAS, These lawsuits send a strong message that the commission, which has no power to compel any state to cooperate, will not go unchallenged; and 

WHEREAS, Individuals associated with the commission have a history of implementing and advocating for voter suppression policies and tactics; and 

WHEREAS, The United States Constitution recognizes the authority and autonomy of the states to regulate the manner of administration of elections, including the maintenance of voter rolls; and 

WHEREAS, Prevention and detection of voter fraud and voter suppression, while simultaneously increasing voter participation among all eligible citizens, should be a paramount goal of all states and the federal government; and 

WHEREAS, States are responsible for protecting the integrity of their elections, including the secrecy of the ballot, security of their election infrastructures, and protection of sensitive personal information included in voter rolls; and 

WHEREAS, Secretary of State Alex Padilla and the chief elections officials of numerous other states have refused to provide the commission with the requested voter data due to concerns over its security and use; and 

WHEREAS, California is recognized as a leader in voter outreach and inclusion, and consistently seeks to eliminate barriers to civic participation; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Senate and the Assembly of the State of California, jointly, That the Legislature urges each state secretary of state and other relevant state elections officials to join California in refusing to provide their state voter data to the Presidential Advisory Commission on Election Integrity; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the secretary of state of each state as well as to each state governor.