Assembly | 02/12/2018 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 09/01/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2274.) (August 29). | ||
Senate | 08/25/2017 | Set for hearing August 29. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |