LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR17
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SJR17
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR17
Action History
Senate
04/30/2018
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Hueso.
Senate
04/09/2018
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
04/05/2018
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4515.) (April 3).
Senate
03/21/2018
Set for hearing April 3.
Senate
02/01/2018
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/17/2018
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.