Senate | 08/09/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 130, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6148.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2018 | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4937.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |