Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 241, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 6019.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6398.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4421.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4312.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4721.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|