Senate | 06/26/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5860.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4226.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |