Senate | 09/12/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 245, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/31/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2018 | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 28). | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 5345.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5313.) (August 14). | ||
Senate | 08/08/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |