Senate | 09/12/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2018 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6793.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Obernolte. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 23). | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6468.) | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2018 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5465.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2018 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |