Senate | 09/07/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 53. Noes 14. Page 2848.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (August 22). | ||
Assembly | 07/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/17/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2069.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1998.) (July 11). | ||
Senate | 07/03/2017 | Set for hearing July 11. | ||
Senate | 06/28/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |