Senate | 08/15/2018 | Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2018 | August 15 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 5325.) | ||
Senate | 08/10/2018 | Set for hearing August 15. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2018 | August 8 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2018 | Set for hearing August 8. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |