Senate | 01/19/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 86.) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 85.) | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Atkins. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 22. Noes 7. Page 84.) | ||
Senate | 01/13/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 70.) (January 13). | ||
Senate | 01/12/2017 | Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |