California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR123 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/24/2018

                            Enrolled  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 123Introduced by Senators Dodd, Stern, and WieckowskiAugust 16, 2018 Relative to National Cyber Security Awareness Month LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 123, Dodd. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Over the last three decades, the Internet has had a phenomenal impact on all parts of societyan open and free cyberspace has been used to promote political and social inclusion worldwide, which has empowered communities and individuals to break down barriers, has allowed collaboration and sharing of information and ideas across the globe, and has provided a forum for freedom of expression and exercise of fundamental rights; andWHEREAS, Cyberspace touches nearly every part of our daily lives; personal relationships and social interactions, schools, hospitals, economies, governments, and infrastructure critical to public safety and national security depend on information and communication technology working seamlessly; and WHEREAS, The reliance on constant connectivity has led to revolutions in medicine, energy, finance, and technology and has improved our society, but it has also introduced new risks, especially to our finances, identity, and privacy; and WHEREAS, For new connected technologies to take off, trust and confidence in the security of those technologies is critically important. However, an overwhelming majority of Californians have reported avoiding disclosing personal information online because of security concerns; and WHEREAS, Recent years have seen that while the digital world brings enormous benefits, it is also vulnerable, with a recent study citing that between 201216, the California Attorney Generals office received reports on 657 data breaches, affecting a total of over 49 million records of Californians; and WHEREAS, In 2015, 178 breaches put over 24 million Californians records at risk, meaning that nearly three in five Californians were victims of a data breach in 2015 alone; and WHEREAS, Cyber security incidents, be it intentional or accidental, are increasing at an alarming pace and could disrupt the supply of essential services we take for granted such as water, health care, electricity, or mobile services; and WHEREAS, Threats can have different origins, including criminal, politically motivated, terrorist, or state-sponsored attacks as well as natural disasters and unintentional mistakes; and WHEREAS, National Cyber Security Awareness Month, sponsored by the National Cyber Security Division within the United States Department of Homeland Security and the National Cyber Security Alliance, is observed each October since its inception in 2004 nationwide; and WHEREAS, National Cyber Security Awareness Month is a campaign designed to engage and educate public and private sector partners through events and initiatives to raise awareness about the importance of cyber security, provide them with tools and resources needed to stay safe online, and increase the resiliency of the nation in the event of a cyber incident; and WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes the critical importance of the fifteenth annual National Cyber Security Awareness Month; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the month of October 1, 2018, to October 31, 2018, inclusive, and every October thereafter, as National Cyber Security Awareness Month in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 123Introduced by Senators Dodd, Stern, and WieckowskiAugust 16, 2018 Relative to National Cyber Security Awareness Month LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 123, Dodd. Digest Key

 Enrolled  August 24, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2018

Enrolled  August 24, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 22, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 123

Introduced by Senators Dodd, Stern, and WieckowskiAugust 16, 2018

Introduced by Senators Dodd, Stern, and Wieckowski
August 16, 2018

 Relative to National Cyber Security Awareness Month 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 123, Dodd. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Over the last three decades, the Internet has had a phenomenal impact on all parts of societyan open and free cyberspace has been used to promote political and social inclusion worldwide, which has empowered communities and individuals to break down barriers, has allowed collaboration and sharing of information and ideas across the globe, and has provided a forum for freedom of expression and exercise of fundamental rights; and

WHEREAS, Cyberspace touches nearly every part of our daily lives; personal relationships and social interactions, schools, hospitals, economies, governments, and infrastructure critical to public safety and national security depend on information and communication technology working seamlessly; and 

WHEREAS, The reliance on constant connectivity has led to revolutions in medicine, energy, finance, and technology and has improved our society, but it has also introduced new risks, especially to our finances, identity, and privacy; and 

WHEREAS, For new connected technologies to take off, trust and confidence in the security of those technologies is critically important. However, an overwhelming majority of Californians have reported avoiding disclosing personal information online because of security concerns; and 

WHEREAS, Recent years have seen that while the digital world brings enormous benefits, it is also vulnerable, with a recent study citing that between 201216, the California Attorney Generals office received reports on 657 data breaches, affecting a total of over 49 million records of Californians; and 

WHEREAS, In 2015, 178 breaches put over 24 million Californians records at risk, meaning that nearly three in five Californians were victims of a data breach in 2015 alone; and 

WHEREAS, Cyber security incidents, be it intentional or accidental, are increasing at an alarming pace and could disrupt the supply of essential services we take for granted such as water, health care, electricity, or mobile services; and 

WHEREAS, Threats can have different origins, including criminal, politically motivated, terrorist, or state-sponsored attacks as well as natural disasters and unintentional mistakes; and 

WHEREAS, National Cyber Security Awareness Month, sponsored by the National Cyber Security Division within the United States Department of Homeland Security and the National Cyber Security Alliance, is observed each October since its inception in 2004 nationwide; and 

WHEREAS, National Cyber Security Awareness Month is a campaign designed to engage and educate public and private sector partners through events and initiatives to raise awareness about the importance of cyber security, provide them with tools and resources needed to stay safe online, and increase the resiliency of the nation in the event of a cyber incident; and 

WHEREAS, The State of California recognizes the critical importance of the fifteenth annual National Cyber Security Awareness Month; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate proclaims the month of October 1, 2018, to October 31, 2018, inclusive, and every October thereafter, as National Cyber Security Awareness Month in the State of California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.