Senate | 06/19/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1613.) | ||
Senate | 06/19/2017 | Amendments by Senator Bates tabled on motion of Senator Monning. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1606.) | ||
Senate | 06/15/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |