1 | | - | Enrolled September 15, 2017 Passed IN Senate September 14, 2017 Amended IN Senate September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 55Introduced by Senators Skinner, Allen, Anderson, Beall, Bradford, Galgiani, Hueso, Lara, Leyva, Monning, Roth, Stern, Stone, and WienerAugust 21, 2017Relative to prosecution of white nationalist and neo-Nazi groups LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 55, Skinner. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The tragic events that took place on August 12, 2017, in Charlottesville, Virginia prove that white nationalism and neo-Nazism remain very real threats to our nations social and racial progress; andWHEREAS, Throughout the course of our nations history, white nationalism has promoted intimidation and violent repression of individuals solely on the basis of their race, ethnicity, religion, sexual orientation, and immigration status; andWHEREAS, Today, white nationalism has attempted to reinvent itself, self-identifying as the Alt-Right, yet its present-day rhetoric and terrorism conjure painful memories of our nations past; andWHEREAS, While free speech is a bedrock value for Americans, white nationalist and neo-Nazi groups promote agendas that are dangerous to public safety and the welfare of our communities because they incite and promote lawless actions and utilize language for the purpose of inciting an immediate breach of the peace by provoking fights and violence; andWHEREAS, White nationalism and neo-Nazism are continuing to grow as menaces to societal order that seek to reignite social animosities, reverse improvements in race relations, divide the nation, and foment hatred, classism, and ethnic eradication; andWHEREAS, The white nationalist and neo-Nazi message of racial and social intolerance has led to senseless acts of violence that continue to terrorize individuals and communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate firmly denounces and opposes the totalitarian impulses, violent terrorism, xenophobic biases, and bigoted ideologies that are promoted by white nationalists and neo-Nazis; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature urges state and local law enforcement to use the full extent of the state laws, including, but not limited to, statutes related to terrorism and hate crimes, to prosecute white nationalist and neo-Nazi individuals who come into our communities and commit violent and destructive acts; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Amended IN Senate September 07, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 55Introduced by Senators Skinner, Beall, Bradford, Galgiani, Lara, Leyva, Monning, Stern, and Wiener(Coauthors: Senators Allen, Anderson, Hueso, Roth, and Stone)August 21, 2017Relative to prosecution of white nationalist and neo-Nazi groups. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 55, as amended, Skinner. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The tragic events that took place on August 12, 2017, in Charlottesville, Virginia prove that white nationalism and neo-Nazism remain very real threats to our nations social and racial progress; andWHEREAS, Throughout the course of our nations history, white nationalism has promoted intimidation and violent repression of individuals solely on the basis of their race, ethnicity, religion, sexual orientation, and immigration status; andWHEREAS, Today, white nationalism has attempted to reinvent itself, self-identifying as the Alt-Right, yet their its present-day rhetoric and terrorism conjure painful memories of our nations past; andWHEREAS, While free speech is a bedrock value for Americans, white nationalist and neo-Nazi groups promote agendas that are dangerous to public safety and the welfare of our communities because they incite and promote lawless actions and utilize language for the purpose of inciting an immediate breach of the peace by provoking fights and violence; andWHEREAS, White nationalism and neo-Nazism are continuing to grow as menaces to societal order that seek to reignite social animosities, reverse improvements in race relations, divide the nation, and foment hatred, classism, and ethnic eradication; andWHEREAS, The white nationalist and neo-Nazi message of racial and social intolerance has led to senseless acts of violence that continue to terrorize individuals and communities; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate firmly denounces and opposes the totalitarian impulses, violent terrorism, xenophobic biases, and bigoted ideologies that are promoted by white nationalists and neo-Nazis; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature urges state and local law enforcement to use the full extent of the state laws, including, but not limited to, statutes related to terrorism and hate crimes, to prosecute white nationalist and neo-Nazi individuals who come into our communities and commit violent and destructive acts; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|