Senate | 09/14/2017 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2930.) | ||
Senate | 09/14/2017 | Amendments by Senator Anderson tabled on motion of Senator Monning. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2897.) | ||
Senate | 09/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2017 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2017 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2017 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |