California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR58 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/15/2017

                    Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 08, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 58Introduced by Senators Wiener, Allen, Glazer, Hertzberg, Jackson, Newman, Stern, and StoneAugust 28, 2017Relative to anti-Semitism and other bias, prejudice, and discrimination LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 58, Wiener. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Across the nation, and in California, there has been a rash of bomb threats targeting Jewish Community Centers, Jewish day schools, synagogues, and other Jewish institutions. In recent years, there has also been a nationwide, including California, increase in discriminatory rhetoric and actions, including cemetery desecrations and verbal and violent anti-Semitic assaults targeting Jewish community members and, specifically, Jewish university students; andWHEREAS, The Federal Bureau of Investigations, ProPublica, Southern Poverty Law Center, Anti-Defamation League, and other reputable groups have identified evidence of hundreds of incidents of anti-Semitic harassment and intimidation throughout the country targeting individuals perceived to be of Jewish ethnic or religious ancestry, or both; andWHEREAS, In the last few months, anti-Semitic chants at protests in Charlottesville, Virginia and LGBT parades in Chicago, Illinois, and the vandalism of Temple Israel in Alameda County, California provide the more recent examples of a rise in anti-Semitic behavior in the United States; andWHEREAS, These anti-Semitic acts appear to come from white-supremacist and neo-Nazi groups, as well as from groups on the far left and right of the political spectrum, and often include anti-Jewish bigotry, including anti-Semitic discrimination rooted in efforts to delegitimize Jewish self-determination or hold Jews collectively responsible for actions by the State of Israel; andWHEREAS, These incidents occur in the context of a steep rise in anti-Semitism globally, and xenophobic discrimination targeting people of diverse backgrounds based on race, color, ancestry, national origin, religion, creed, age, disability, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, medical condition, genetic information, marital status, and veteran status; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That, in light of the volume and frequency of acts of intolerance and xenophobia, and the evolving nature of anti-Semitism, the Senate hereby reaffirms its commitment to an open and inclusive state that actively opposes all forms of prejudice, bias, or discrimination; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate will work to uphold principles of equality, pluralism, and inclusivity, and will stand in solidarity with Jewish and other communities whenever they are targeted or marginalized; and be it furtherResolved, That nothing in this resolution may be construed to diminish or infringe upon free speech or any other right that is protected under the First Amendment of the Constitution of the United States; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 08, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 58Introduced by Senators Wiener, Allen, Glazer, Hertzberg, Jackson, Newman, Stern, and StoneAugust 28, 2017Relative to anti-Semitism and other bias, prejudice, and discrimination LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 58, Wiener. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 08, 2017 Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017

Enrolled  September 15, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  September 08, 2017
Amended IN  Senate  September 01, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 58

Introduced by Senators Wiener, Allen, Glazer, Hertzberg, Jackson, Newman, Stern, and StoneAugust 28, 2017

Introduced by Senators Wiener, Allen, Glazer, Hertzberg, Jackson, Newman, Stern, and Stone
August 28, 2017

Relative to anti-Semitism and other bias, prejudice, and discrimination 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 58, Wiener. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Across the nation, and in California, there has been a rash of bomb threats targeting Jewish Community Centers, Jewish day schools, synagogues, and other Jewish institutions. In recent years, there has also been a nationwide, including California, increase in discriminatory rhetoric and actions, including cemetery desecrations and verbal and violent anti-Semitic assaults targeting Jewish community members and, specifically, Jewish university students; and

WHEREAS, The Federal Bureau of Investigations, ProPublica, Southern Poverty Law Center, Anti-Defamation League, and other reputable groups have identified evidence of hundreds of incidents of anti-Semitic harassment and intimidation throughout the country targeting individuals perceived to be of Jewish ethnic or religious ancestry, or both; and

WHEREAS, In the last few months, anti-Semitic chants at protests in Charlottesville, Virginia and LGBT parades in Chicago, Illinois, and the vandalism of Temple Israel in Alameda County, California provide the more recent examples of a rise in anti-Semitic behavior in the United States; and

WHEREAS, These anti-Semitic acts appear to come from white-supremacist and neo-Nazi groups, as well as from groups on the far left and right of the political spectrum, and often include anti-Jewish bigotry, including anti-Semitic discrimination rooted in efforts to delegitimize Jewish self-determination or hold Jews collectively responsible for actions by the State of Israel; and

WHEREAS, These incidents occur in the context of a steep rise in anti-Semitism globally, and xenophobic discrimination targeting people of diverse backgrounds based on race, color, ancestry, national origin, religion, creed, age, disability, sex, sexual orientation, gender identity, medical condition, genetic information, marital status, and veteran status; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That, in light of the volume and frequency of acts of intolerance and xenophobia, and the evolving nature of anti-Semitism, the Senate hereby reaffirms its commitment to an open and inclusive state that actively opposes all forms of prejudice, bias, or discrimination; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate will work to uphold principles of equality, pluralism, and inclusivity, and will stand in solidarity with Jewish and other communities whenever they are targeted or marginalized; and be it further

Resolved, That nothing in this resolution may be construed to diminish or infringe upon free speech or any other right that is protected under the First Amendment of the Constitution of the United States; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.