California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR59 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/07/2017

                            Enrolled  September 07, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 59Introduced by Senator DoddAugust 30, 2017 Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 59, Dodd. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Latex allergy patients face a constant threat to their lives from exposure to rubber latex allergens; reactions can be elicited by touching a product containing natural rubber latex, breathing airborne latex proteins, or digesting food prepared using latex gloves; andWHEREAS, The incidence of latex allergies has increased due to widespread exposure to products containing latex; andWHEREAS, Up to 6 percent of people in the United States are estimated to have latex allergies, including up to 17 percent of health care and food service workers, 11 percent of the elderly, and up to 68 percent of children with spina bifida; andWHEREAS, Exposure to natural rubber latex results in up to 10 deaths per year in the community of latex allergy patients and is the second most common cause of anaphylaxis in the operating room; andWHEREAS, Patients with a latex allergy may also experience allergic symptoms when eating certain fruits, vegetables, and nuts, including, among other things, banana, avocado, kiwi, tomato, carrot, and chestnut; andWHEREAS, There is no cure for a latex allergy, and every exposure increases the sensitivity and severity of the patients condition, with distress and rebound reactions for days after exposure; andWHEREAS, Latex allergies can only be prevented by avoiding all latex-related products, which can be found at homes, child care centers, stores, schools, workplaces, and health care environments, among other places; andWHEREAS, Natural rubber is found in over 40,000 products, including, but not limited to, hair accessories, toys, balloons, school and office supplies, sports equipment, and medical devices, resulting in a daily struggle for latex allergy patients to balance life and work with staying safe and healthy; andWHEREAS, Latex allergies result in a growing number of workers compensation claims arising from workplace exposure to products containing natural rubber latex; andWHEREAS, The Allergy and Asthma Network creates awareness of latex allergies through education and provides support to individuals who have been diagnosed with a latex allergy; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims the week of October 1, 2017, through October 7, 2017, as Latex Allergy Awareness Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate encourages all Californians to be informed about the causes, symptoms, treatment, and prevention of latex allergies; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 07, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 59Introduced by Senator DoddAugust 30, 2017 Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 59, Dodd. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 07, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2017

Enrolled  September 07, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  September 05, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 59

Introduced by Senator DoddAugust 30, 2017

Introduced by Senator Dodd
August 30, 2017

 Relative to Latex Allergy Awareness Week 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 59, Dodd. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Latex allergy patients face a constant threat to their lives from exposure to rubber latex allergens; reactions can be elicited by touching a product containing natural rubber latex, breathing airborne latex proteins, or digesting food prepared using latex gloves; and

WHEREAS, The incidence of latex allergies has increased due to widespread exposure to products containing latex; and

WHEREAS, Up to 6 percent of people in the United States are estimated to have latex allergies, including up to 17 percent of health care and food service workers, 11 percent of the elderly, and up to 68 percent of children with spina bifida; and

WHEREAS, Exposure to natural rubber latex results in up to 10 deaths per year in the community of latex allergy patients and is the second most common cause of anaphylaxis in the operating room; and

WHEREAS, Patients with a latex allergy may also experience allergic symptoms when eating certain fruits, vegetables, and nuts, including, among other things, banana, avocado, kiwi, tomato, carrot, and chestnut; and

WHEREAS, There is no cure for a latex allergy, and every exposure increases the sensitivity and severity of the patients condition, with distress and rebound reactions for days after exposure; and

WHEREAS, Latex allergies can only be prevented by avoiding all latex-related products, which can be found at homes, child care centers, stores, schools, workplaces, and health care environments, among other places; and

WHEREAS, Natural rubber is found in over 40,000 products, including, but not limited to, hair accessories, toys, balloons, school and office supplies, sports equipment, and medical devices, resulting in a daily struggle for latex allergy patients to balance life and work with staying safe and healthy; and

WHEREAS, Latex allergies result in a growing number of workers compensation claims arising from workplace exposure to products containing natural rubber latex; and

WHEREAS, The Allergy and Asthma Network creates awareness of latex allergies through education and provides support to individuals who have been diagnosed with a latex allergy; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate hereby proclaims the week of October 1, 2017, through October 7, 2017, as Latex Allergy Awareness Week in California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate encourages all Californians to be informed about the causes, symptoms, treatment, and prevention of latex allergies; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.