California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR68 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/15/2017

                            Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 68Introduced by Senator MoorlachSeptember 11, 2017 Relative to the 500th Anniversary of the Protestant Reformation LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 68, Moorlach. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, October 31, 2017, will mark the 500th anniversary of the posting of the 95 Theses on the Schlosskirche in Wittenberg, Germany, by scholar and priest Martin Luther; andWHEREAS, The event in Wittenberg is widely credited as an inflection point in history for the Protestant Reformation and for accelerating the European Renaissance; andWHEREAS, Luther, an Augustinian monk, was influenced by previous religious scholars, such as John Wycliffe and Jan Huss, who appealed to the authority of the Bible in theological debates and wished scripture to be available to the people in their own vernacular; andWHEREAS, This phenomenon was not immediately embraced by authorities, and reformers faced punishment from the church and the state for their actions, with some condemned to death; andWHEREAS, Despite the dangers these reformers faced because of their intellectual curiosity, the Reformation inspired subsequent independent thought and teachings, such as that of Huldrych Zwingli and John Calvin who led a complicated reform movement that centered in Geneva; andWHEREAS, Just decades after the beginning of the Reformation, the Church of England was founded by King Henry VIII. Years later, church reformers known as Puritans became prevalent in English religious and political affairs; andWHEREAS, The success of the Reformation and Renaissance brought about many political, scientific, academic, military, and technological achievements. Among these achievements were advanced development of the printing press, increased innovation and exploration, and a desire for independence from the control of the church and the state; andWHEREAS, In 1620, many Puritans left England and formed colonies in the New World that eventually became the basis for the United States of America; andWHEREAS, Protestant principles of hard work, entrepreneurialism, and education were recognized by scholars lauding the American republican experiment and its cause for life, liberty, and the pursuit of happiness; andWHEREAS, These 500 years later, the actions of Luther and the Reformation have occasioned deeper and more fruitful ecumenical dialogue leading to renewed mutual understanding of common faith in Christ and collaborative expressions of evangelizing others and living in that faith for the common good; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California,That the Senate recognizes the 500th Anniversary of the Protestant Reformation; and be it furtherResolved,That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 68Introduced by Senator MoorlachSeptember 11, 2017 Relative to the 500th Anniversary of the Protestant Reformation LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 68, Moorlach. Digest Key

 Enrolled  September 15, 2017 Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017

Enrolled  September 15, 2017
Passed IN  Senate  September 14, 2017

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 68

Introduced by Senator MoorlachSeptember 11, 2017

Introduced by Senator Moorlach
September 11, 2017

 Relative to the 500th Anniversary of the Protestant Reformation 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 68, Moorlach. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, October 31, 2017, will mark the 500th anniversary of the posting of the 95 Theses on the Schlosskirche in Wittenberg, Germany, by scholar and priest Martin Luther; and

WHEREAS, The event in Wittenberg is widely credited as an inflection point in history for the Protestant Reformation and for accelerating the European Renaissance; and

WHEREAS, Luther, an Augustinian monk, was influenced by previous religious scholars, such as John Wycliffe and Jan Huss, who appealed to the authority of the Bible in theological debates and wished scripture to be available to the people in their own vernacular; and

WHEREAS, This phenomenon was not immediately embraced by authorities, and reformers faced punishment from the church and the state for their actions, with some condemned to death; and

WHEREAS, Despite the dangers these reformers faced because of their intellectual curiosity, the Reformation inspired subsequent independent thought and teachings, such as that of Huldrych Zwingli and John Calvin who led a complicated reform movement that centered in Geneva; and

WHEREAS, Just decades after the beginning of the Reformation, the Church of England was founded by King Henry VIII. Years later, church reformers known as Puritans became prevalent in English religious and political affairs; and

WHEREAS, The success of the Reformation and Renaissance brought about many political, scientific, academic, military, and technological achievements. Among these achievements were advanced development of the printing press, increased innovation and exploration, and a desire for independence from the control of the church and the state; and

WHEREAS, In 1620, many Puritans left England and formed colonies in the New World that eventually became the basis for the United States of America; and

WHEREAS, Protestant principles of hard work, entrepreneurialism, and education were recognized by scholars lauding the American republican experiment and its cause for life, liberty, and the pursuit of happiness; and

WHEREAS, These 500 years later, the actions of Luther and the Reformation have occasioned deeper and more fruitful ecumenical dialogue leading to renewed mutual understanding of common faith in Christ and collaborative expressions of evangelizing others and living in that faith for the common good; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California,That the Senate recognizes the 500th Anniversary of the Protestant Reformation; and be it further

Resolved,That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.