LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR72
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR72
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR72
Action History
Senate
01/22/2018
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4058.)
Senate
01/16/2018
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4043.) (January 16).
Senate
01/11/2018
Set for hearing January 16.
Senate
01/10/2018
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Senate
01/04/2018
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.