Senate | 05/17/2018 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5085.) | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | (Corrected May 10). | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | From inactive file on motion of Senator Morrell. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Morrell. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2018 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |