California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR80 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/13/2018

                            Enrolled  February 13, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  February 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 80Introduced by Senators Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and SkinnerFebruary 01, 2018Relative to Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 80, Atkins. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, The annual California Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week is from Sunday, February 11 to Saturday, February 17, 2018, inclusive. The earned income tax credit (EITC) is an effective tool used to lift families and children out of poverty. In 2016, California took a momentous step forward on behalf of the working poor by joining 26 states and the District of Columbia by establishing the states earned income tax credit (CalEITC); andWHEREAS, With hundreds of millions of dollars allocated for working Californians, qualifying families will receive the CalEITC refund, providing more in their pockets to support basic needs. In its first year, CalEITC boosted the income of nearly 400,000 Californians through nearly $200 million in refunds. In California alone, an estimated $2 billion of state and federal EITC has not been used. This significant resource will help the working poor bring economic security to their lives by supporting costs, including, but not limited to, food, housing, health care, education, and transportation; andWHEREAS, In addition to providing economic security, CalEITC can have a positive impact on the overall wellness of California families, especially children. Tax credits are associated with better overall outcomes of a childs health and education. Children whose families receive a boost in income from EITC perform better in school, making them more likely to finish high school, pursue higher education, and have higher earnings as adults; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That in recognition of the importance of the CalEITC, February 11 to February 17, 2018, inclusive, is declared Californias Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week to encourage all Californians to spread the word about this important resource to those who need it most; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 13, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  February 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 80Introduced by Senators Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and SkinnerFebruary 01, 2018Relative to Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 80, Atkins. Digest Key

 Enrolled  February 13, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  February 05, 2018

Enrolled  February 13, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  February 12, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  February 05, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 80

Introduced by Senators Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and SkinnerFebruary 01, 2018

Introduced by Senators Atkins, Bates, Fuller, Galgiani, Jackson, Leyva, Nguyen, and Skinner
February 01, 2018

Relative to Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 80, Atkins. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, The annual California Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week is from Sunday, February 11 to Saturday, February 17, 2018, inclusive. The earned income tax credit (EITC) is an effective tool used to lift families and children out of poverty. In 2016, California took a momentous step forward on behalf of the working poor by joining 26 states and the District of Columbia by establishing the states earned income tax credit (CalEITC); and

WHEREAS, With hundreds of millions of dollars allocated for working Californians, qualifying families will receive the CalEITC refund, providing more in their pockets to support basic needs. In its first year, CalEITC boosted the income of nearly 400,000 Californians through nearly $200 million in refunds. In California alone, an estimated $2 billion of state and federal EITC has not been used. This significant resource will help the working poor bring economic security to their lives by supporting costs, including, but not limited to, food, housing, health care, education, and transportation; and

WHEREAS, In addition to providing economic security, CalEITC can have a positive impact on the overall wellness of California families, especially children. Tax credits are associated with better overall outcomes of a childs health and education. Children whose families receive a boost in income from EITC perform better in school, making them more likely to finish high school, pursue higher education, and have higher earnings as adults; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That in recognition of the importance of the CalEITC, February 11 to February 17, 2018, inclusive, is declared Californias Earned Income Tax Credit Awareness Week to encourage all Californians to spread the word about this important resource to those who need it most; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.