California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR86 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/20/2018

                            Enrolled  March 20, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  March 19, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 86Introduced by Senator HillFebruary 22, 2018 Relative to Progressive Multiple Sclerosis (MS) Awareness DayLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 86, Hill. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, There are nearly one million people in the United States living with Multiple Sclerosis (MS), a chronic, disabling disease of the central nervous system for which there is no cure; andWHEREAS, Up to 80 percent of people with MS may develop a progressive form of the disease, characterized as progressive worsening of neurologic function over time; andWHEREAS, MS is at least two to three times more common in women than in men, and is typically diagnosed when individuals are in the prime of their lives, between the ages of 20 and 50; andWHEREAS, MS can cause many symptoms, including blurred vision, loss of balance, poor coordination, slurred speech, tremors, numbness, extreme fatigue, problems with memory and concentration, paralysis, blindness, and more; and WHEREAS, Due to these symptoms and progression of the disease, people with MS, their families, caregivers, employers, and the entire health care system carry substantial clinical and economic burdens over a period of many years; andWHEREAS, Lost productivity related to loss of employment or the need to retire early due to disease progression may be the largest single factor that contributes to the nonmedical financial, familial, and societal costs of MS; andWHEREAS, Early and appropriate treatment, including the use of disease-modifying therapies, can markedly reduce disease activity and accumulation of disability, potentially allowing patients to have a more active and independent lifestyle; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That people living with MS, together with their families, should be empowered to seek out information to make decisions about the treatment and care they receive; and be it furtherResolved, That March 28, 2018, and annually each March 28 thereafter, be known as Progressive Multiple Sclerosis (MS) Day in California to increase awareness of this disabling disease and support patients living with progressive forms of MS; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  March 20, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  March 19, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 86Introduced by Senator HillFebruary 22, 2018 Relative to Progressive Multiple Sclerosis (MS) Awareness DayLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 86, Hill. Digest Key

 Enrolled  March 20, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  March 19, 2018

Enrolled  March 20, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  March 19, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 86

Introduced by Senator HillFebruary 22, 2018

Introduced by Senator Hill
February 22, 2018

 Relative to Progressive Multiple Sclerosis (MS) Awareness Day

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 86, Hill. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, There are nearly one million people in the United States living with Multiple Sclerosis (MS), a chronic, disabling disease of the central nervous system for which there is no cure; and

WHEREAS, Up to 80 percent of people with MS may develop a progressive form of the disease, characterized as progressive worsening of neurologic function over time; and

WHEREAS, MS is at least two to three times more common in women than in men, and is typically diagnosed when individuals are in the prime of their lives, between the ages of 20 and 50; and

WHEREAS, MS can cause many symptoms, including blurred vision, loss of balance, poor coordination, slurred speech, tremors, numbness, extreme fatigue, problems with memory and concentration, paralysis, blindness, and more; and 

WHEREAS, Due to these symptoms and progression of the disease, people with MS, their families, caregivers, employers, and the entire health care system carry substantial clinical and economic burdens over a period of many years; and

WHEREAS, Lost productivity related to loss of employment or the need to retire early due to disease progression may be the largest single factor that contributes to the nonmedical financial, familial, and societal costs of MS; and

WHEREAS, Early and appropriate treatment, including the use of disease-modifying therapies, can markedly reduce disease activity and accumulation of disability, potentially allowing patients to have a more active and independent lifestyle; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That people living with MS, together with their families, should be empowered to seek out information to make decisions about the treatment and care they receive; and be it further

Resolved, That March 28, 2018, and annually each March 28 thereafter, be known as Progressive Multiple Sclerosis (MS) Day in California to increase awareness of this disabling disease and support patients living with progressive forms of MS; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.