California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SR95 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/03/2018

                    Enrolled  April 03, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 02, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  March 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 95Introduced by Senator HuesoMarch 20, 2018Relative to California Diversity in STEM and Tech WeekLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 95, Hueso. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) are critical fields for the success of Californias technology and innovation economy; andWHEREAS, Many of the fastest growing occupations in the United States require some form of expertise in the areas of STEM; andWHEREAS, STEM careers represent some of the highest-paying positions in any field, thereby providing desirable career opportunities and real pathways out of poverty; andWHEREAS, Preparing students for the STEM workforce is essential to fulfill the demands of our 21st century, innovation-focused economy; andWHEREAS, A significant diversity gap exists in participation in STEM disciplines and the technology workforce; andWHEREAS, While women make up nearly 50 percent of the working population, they represent only about 28 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, While African Americans constitute 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 5 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, While Latinos make up 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 6 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, Only 4.9 percent of the total workforce identifies as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer (LGBTQ), with an estimated 20 percent fewer LGBTQ workers in government STEM-related jobs than should be expected; andWHEREAS, While women and underrepresented communities constitute about 70 percent of college students, they earn only 45 percent of STEM degrees; andWHEREAS, Out of the total bachelors degrees earned in STEM fields, only 45 percent are earned by women, and only 36 percent are earned by underrepresented minorities; andWHEREAS, In California, the diversity disparities in STEM education are similar, if not more pronounced, as only 16 percent of computer science graduates in California are women; andWHEREAS, Despite underrepresentation in the STEM fields, there are many individuals from these minority backgrounds in California who serve as role models for youth preparing for STEM careers; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate encourages all citizens, community organizations, and the technology industry to support the observance of California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week by encouraging and celebrating diversity in the STEM fields and in Californias technology and innovation economy; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate declares the week of April 1, 2018, to April 7, 2018, inclusive, as California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  April 03, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 02, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  March 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 95Introduced by Senator HuesoMarch 20, 2018Relative to California Diversity in STEM and Tech WeekLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 95, Hueso. Digest Key

 Enrolled  April 03, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  April 02, 2018 Amended IN  Senate  March 22, 2018

Enrolled  April 03, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  April 02, 2018
Amended IN  Senate  March 22, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Senate Resolution No. 95

Introduced by Senator HuesoMarch 20, 2018

Introduced by Senator Hueso
March 20, 2018

Relative to California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

SR 95, Hueso. 



## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) are critical fields for the success of Californias technology and innovation economy; and

WHEREAS, Many of the fastest growing occupations in the United States require some form of expertise in the areas of STEM; and

WHEREAS, STEM careers represent some of the highest-paying positions in any field, thereby providing desirable career opportunities and real pathways out of poverty; and

WHEREAS, Preparing students for the STEM workforce is essential to fulfill the demands of our 21st century, innovation-focused economy; and

WHEREAS, A significant diversity gap exists in participation in STEM disciplines and the technology workforce; and

WHEREAS, While women make up nearly 50 percent of the working population, they represent only about 28 percent of the STEM workforce; and

WHEREAS, While African Americans constitute 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 5 percent of the STEM workforce; and

WHEREAS, While Latinos make up 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 6 percent of the STEM workforce; and

WHEREAS, Only 4.9 percent of the total workforce identifies as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer (LGBTQ), with an estimated 20 percent fewer LGBTQ workers in government STEM-related jobs than should be expected; and

WHEREAS, While women and underrepresented communities constitute about 70 percent of college students, they earn only 45 percent of STEM degrees; and

WHEREAS, Out of the total bachelors degrees earned in STEM fields, only 45 percent are earned by women, and only 36 percent are earned by underrepresented minorities; and

WHEREAS, In California, the diversity disparities in STEM education are similar, if not more pronounced, as only 16 percent of computer science graduates in California are women; and

WHEREAS, Despite underrepresentation in the STEM fields, there are many individuals from these minority backgrounds in California who serve as role models for youth preparing for STEM careers; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate encourages all citizens, community organizations, and the technology industry to support the observance of California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week by encouraging and celebrating diversity in the STEM fields and in Californias technology and innovation economy; and be it further

Resolved, That the Senate declares the week of April 1, 2018, to April 7, 2018, inclusive, as California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week; and be it further

Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.