Enrolled April 03, 2018 Passed IN Senate April 02, 2018 Amended IN Senate March 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 95Introduced by Senator HuesoMarch 20, 2018Relative to California Diversity in STEM and Tech WeekLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 95, Hueso. Digest KeyBill TextWHEREAS, Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) are critical fields for the success of Californias technology and innovation economy; andWHEREAS, Many of the fastest growing occupations in the United States require some form of expertise in the areas of STEM; andWHEREAS, STEM careers represent some of the highest-paying positions in any field, thereby providing desirable career opportunities and real pathways out of poverty; andWHEREAS, Preparing students for the STEM workforce is essential to fulfill the demands of our 21st century, innovation-focused economy; andWHEREAS, A significant diversity gap exists in participation in STEM disciplines and the technology workforce; andWHEREAS, While women make up nearly 50 percent of the working population, they represent only about 28 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, While African Americans constitute 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 5 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, While Latinos make up 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 6 percent of the STEM workforce; andWHEREAS, Only 4.9 percent of the total workforce identifies as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer (LGBTQ), with an estimated 20 percent fewer LGBTQ workers in government STEM-related jobs than should be expected; andWHEREAS, While women and underrepresented communities constitute about 70 percent of college students, they earn only 45 percent of STEM degrees; andWHEREAS, Out of the total bachelors degrees earned in STEM fields, only 45 percent are earned by women, and only 36 percent are earned by underrepresented minorities; andWHEREAS, In California, the diversity disparities in STEM education are similar, if not more pronounced, as only 16 percent of computer science graduates in California are women; andWHEREAS, Despite underrepresentation in the STEM fields, there are many individuals from these minority backgrounds in California who serve as role models for youth preparing for STEM careers; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate encourages all citizens, community organizations, and the technology industry to support the observance of California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week by encouraging and celebrating diversity in the STEM fields and in Californias technology and innovation economy; and be it furtherResolved, That the Senate declares the week of April 1, 2018, to April 7, 2018, inclusive, as California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week; and be it furtherResolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. Enrolled April 03, 2018 Passed IN Senate April 02, 2018 Amended IN Senate March 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 95Introduced by Senator HuesoMarch 20, 2018Relative to California Diversity in STEM and Tech WeekLEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSR 95, Hueso. Digest Key Enrolled April 03, 2018 Passed IN Senate April 02, 2018 Amended IN Senate March 22, 2018 Enrolled April 03, 2018 Passed IN Senate April 02, 2018 Amended IN Senate March 22, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Senate Resolution No. 95 Introduced by Senator HuesoMarch 20, 2018 Introduced by Senator Hueso March 20, 2018 Relative to California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SR 95, Hueso. ## Digest Key ## Bill Text WHEREAS, Science, Technology, Engineering, and Mathematics (STEM) are critical fields for the success of Californias technology and innovation economy; and WHEREAS, Many of the fastest growing occupations in the United States require some form of expertise in the areas of STEM; and WHEREAS, STEM careers represent some of the highest-paying positions in any field, thereby providing desirable career opportunities and real pathways out of poverty; and WHEREAS, Preparing students for the STEM workforce is essential to fulfill the demands of our 21st century, innovation-focused economy; and WHEREAS, A significant diversity gap exists in participation in STEM disciplines and the technology workforce; and WHEREAS, While women make up nearly 50 percent of the working population, they represent only about 28 percent of the STEM workforce; and WHEREAS, While African Americans constitute 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 5 percent of the STEM workforce; and WHEREAS, While Latinos make up 17 percent of the United States population, they represent only 6 percent of the STEM workforce; and WHEREAS, Only 4.9 percent of the total workforce identifies as lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or queer (LGBTQ), with an estimated 20 percent fewer LGBTQ workers in government STEM-related jobs than should be expected; and WHEREAS, While women and underrepresented communities constitute about 70 percent of college students, they earn only 45 percent of STEM degrees; and WHEREAS, Out of the total bachelors degrees earned in STEM fields, only 45 percent are earned by women, and only 36 percent are earned by underrepresented minorities; and WHEREAS, In California, the diversity disparities in STEM education are similar, if not more pronounced, as only 16 percent of computer science graduates in California are women; and WHEREAS, Despite underrepresentation in the STEM fields, there are many individuals from these minority backgrounds in California who serve as role models for youth preparing for STEM careers; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, That the Senate encourages all citizens, community organizations, and the technology industry to support the observance of California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week by encouraging and celebrating diversity in the STEM fields and in Californias technology and innovation economy; and be it further Resolved, That the Senate declares the week of April 1, 2018, to April 7, 2018, inclusive, as California Diversity in STEM and Tech Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.