LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR96
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SR96
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SR96
Action History
Senate
07/02/2018
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 5028.)
Senate
04/18/2018
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
04/17/2018
Ordered to second reading.
Senate
04/17/2018
Read third time and amended.
Senate
04/04/2018
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Senate
03/21/2018
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.