California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2019

Amended

Bill August 20, 2019
Bill August 14, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill May 22, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019