|
07/31/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 164, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2053.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1823.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|