California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1046 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Amended

Bill August 13, 2019
Bill July 5, 2019
Bill June 20, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019