California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1058 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Amended

Bill June 25, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019