|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2575.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1981.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|