|
07/31/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2057.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 1569.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|