Senate
|
07/22/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS., GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1779.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|