|
10/01/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 388, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3564.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2925.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2076.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|