California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1118 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill September 4, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019