|
09/11/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 65, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5375.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4290.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 3906.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|